EP0466515 - Oxygen scavenger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | For all designated states KIRIN BREWERY COMPANY, LIMITED 26-1 Jingumae 6-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-11 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | ||
For all designated states KIRIN BREWERY COMPANY, LIMITED 26-1 Jingumae 6-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-11 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Shinichi 3-1-112, Sonoyama 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga, 520 / JP | 02 /
Sakuma, Isamu 13-20, Kitaoji 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga, 520 / JP | 03 /
Himeshima, Yoshio, Toray Yokohamaryo 121, Sengendai, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 220 / JP | 04 /
Aoki, Takao 125-28, Seta Hashimoto-cho Otsu-shi, Shiga, 520-21 / JP | 05 /
Uemura, Tadahiro 18-2-502, Naginotsuji Higashiura-cho Yamashina-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607 / JP | 06 /
Shirakura, Akira Sakuracorpo 301, 2-8-10, Tomigaya Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151 / JP | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306375.6 | 15.07.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | JP19900186457 | 13.07.1990 Original published format: JP 18645790 | [1992/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0466515 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0466515 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/3436, B65D81/26, B65D51/28 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
A23L3/3436 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (KR);
B65D81/267 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1366 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1376 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1383 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/21 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24992 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249978 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249979 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24998 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/34] | A23L3/3436, B65D51/26, B65D51/28 | ||
Former IPC [1992/03] | B65D81/26, A23L3/3436, B65D51/28 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/03] | Title | German: | Sauerstoffabsorber | [1992/03] | English: | Oxygen scavenger | [1992/03] | French: | Absorbeur d'oxygène | [1992/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/22] | 07.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0326464 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]); | [X]US4332845 (NAWATA TAKANARI, et al); | [A]DE2948264 ; | [A]EP0299845 (BONGRAIN SA [FR]); | [A]EP0366254 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |