EP0468713 - Edge encapsulated panel and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PILKINGTON PLC Prescot Road St. Helens Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states PILKINGTON PLC Prescot Road St. Helens, Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morris, Peter 50 Avery Road, Haydock St. Helens, Merseyside WA11 0XA / GB | 02 /
Holland, Anthony Richard 26 Broadgate Avenue St. Helens, Merseyside WA9 5AJ / GB | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Pendlebury, Anthony, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1992/05] | Application number, filing date | 91306607.2 | 19.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | GB19900016059 | 21.07.1990 Original published format: GB 9016059 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468713 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468713 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/00, B29C45/14 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
B29C45/14377 (EP);
B60J1/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1992/05] | Title | German: | Platte mit einer Randeinfassung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1992/05] | English: | Edge encapsulated panel and process for producing the same | [1992/05] | French: | Panneau bordé d'un encadrement et son procédé de fabrication | [1992/05] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 14.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 28.12.1994 | SE | 28.03.1995 | [1995/49] |
Former [1995/42] | SE | 28.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0242223 ; | [A]US4723809 ; | [AD]GB2011517 ; | [AD]GB2147244 ; | [AD]US4732553 ; | [AD]US4688752 ; | [AD]WO8704973 |