EP0471457 - Herpesvirus-based viral vector which expresses a foot & mouth disease virus epitope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVAGENE, INC. P.O. Box 270275 Houston Texas 77277 / US | For all designated states Baylor College of Medicine Texas Medical Center 1200 Moursund Avenue Houston Texas 77030 / US | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states NOVAGENE, INC. P.O. Box 270275 Houston Texas 77277 / US | ||
For all designated states Baylor College of Medicine Texas Medical Center 1200 Moursund Avenue Houston Texas 77030 / US | |||
For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dimarchi, Richard Dennis 3815 Wolf Creek Circle Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 02 /
Kit, Saul 11935 Wink Drive Houston, Texas 77024 / US | 03 /
Little, Sheila Parks 4629 Sunset Avenue Indianapolis, Indiana 46208 / US | 04 /
Gale, Charles 6627 East Pleasant Run Parkway, South Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46219 / US | 05 /
Kit, Malon 11935 Wink Drive Houston, Texas 77024 / US | [1992/08] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306646.0 | 22.07.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | US19900556593 | 24.07.1990 Original published format: US 556593 | [1992/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0471457 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0471457 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, A61K39/135, C12N15/42 | [1992/08] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16643 (EP);
C12N2770/32122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | Herpesvirus-Vektor, der ein Epitope des Maul- und Klauenseuchenviruses exprimiert | [1992/08] | English: | Herpesvirus-based viral vector which expresses a foot & mouth disease virus epitope | [1992/08] | French: | Vecteur herpesviral exprimant un épitope du virus de la fièvre aphteuse | [1992/08] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 01.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/31] | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8704463 (SYNTRO CORP [US]); | [Y]WO8810300 (MEDICO LABS AG [CH]); | [Y]EP0326127 (NOVAGENE INC [US], et al); | [YP]WO9103255 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) | [XP] - VACCINES, vol. 91, 1991, New York, (USA) pages 327-332; KIT M. et al.: "Infectious Bovine Rhinotracheitis Virus vector that expresses foot-and-mouth disease virus epitopes on the surface of viral particles and virus infected cells"; & EIGHT ANNUAL MEETING, COLD SPRING HARBOR, NY(US) September 1990 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 17, October 1986, Columbus, Ohio, (US) abstract no. 147512P, NEWTON, S.E. et al.: "Expression of a foot-and-mouth disease virus immunogenic site sequence in vaccinia virus" page 199; colum 2; & VACCINES 86, NEW APPROACHES IN IMMUNOLOGY 1986pages 303-309 |