EP0468735 - Electrostatic spraying method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/05] | Electrostatic spraying device and method | ||
[1995/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1992/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noakes, Timothy James The Hollies, Llyn-y-Pandy Lane Pantymwyn, Nr Mold, Clwyd CH7 5JF / GB | 02 /
Reed, Brian 51 Pleydell Road Swindon SN1 4DJ / GB | 03 /
Chambers, John James 7 Somerford road Cirencester, Gloucestershire / GB | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Collingwood, Anthony Robert, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester, M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Collingwood, Anthony Robert, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306674.2 | 23.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | GB19900016346 | 25.07.1990 Original published format: GB 9016346 | GB19910014343 | 03.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9114343 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468735 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468735 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B05B5/053 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
B05B5/003 (EP,US);
B05B5/0255 (EP,US);
B05B5/053 (EP,US);
H02M7/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/05] | Title | German: | Elektrostatische Sprühmethode | [1995/18] | English: | Electrostatic spraying method | [1995/18] | French: | Méthode de pulvérisation électrostatique | [1995/18] |
Former [1992/05] | Elektrostatische Sprühvorrichtung und Verfahren | ||
Former [1992/05] | Electrostatic spraying device and method | ||
Former [1992/05] | Dispositif de pulvérisation électrostatique et méthode | Examination procedure | 25.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 10.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Request for further processing for: | 31.03.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US1958406 (DARRAH WILLIAM A); | [AD]GB2128900 (CHRISTOFIDIS THEOKTISTE) |