EP0524355 - Two-shaft continuous mixing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18 Wakinohama-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18 Wakinohama-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Hiroshi W6202, 10-6, 2-Chome, Kitaohgi Higashinada-ku, Kobe-shi / JP | 02 /
Imuta, Kazuyoshi 35-44, 3-chome, Koujidai Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Hirofumi 263-52, 4-chome, Minamibefu Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi / JP | 04 /
Tashiro, Naoyuki 3-1, 2-chome, Shinoharaobanoyama-cho Nada-ku, Kobe-shi / JP | 05 /
Yasuda, Syouji 11-16, 1-chome, Higashinanamatsu-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Bailey, David Martin, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Bailey, David Martin, et al Brookes & Martin High Holborn House 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | ||
Former [1993/34] | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al BROOKES AND MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | ||
Former [1993/04] | Woodcraft, David Charles BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306701.3 | 23.07.1991 | [1993/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524355 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524355 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/48, B29B7/42, B01F7/08, B01F15/02 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
B29B7/488 (EP,US);
B29C48/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1993/04] | Title | German: | Mit zwei Wellen kontinuierlich arbeitende Mischvorrichtung | [1993/04] | English: | Two-shaft continuous mixing apparatus | [1993/04] | French: | Appareil de mélange continu à deux arbres | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1991 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 08.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59159328 ; | [A]US4310251 (SCHARER HANS R, et al); | [A]US4332481 (INOUE KIMIO, et al); | [A]US4332480 (ANDERS DIETMAR); | [A]US4681457 (ORIMO TAIJI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 11 (M-351)(1734), 18 January 1985; & JP - A - 59159328 (KOBE SEIKOSHO K.K.) 08.09.1984, & JP59159328 A 19850118 |