EP0473281 - Passive microwave near-field tomographic imaging system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.1995 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Donald C.D. 3142 Montagne Way Thousand Oaks, California 91362 / US | 02 /
Gurley, Joseph G. 10901 Savona Road Los Angeles, California 90024 / US | 03 /
Hagen, Frank A. 12561 Sanford Street Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 04 /
Reynolds, Samuel C. 3525 Sawtelle Blvd., No.210 Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 05 /
Yung, Kar W. 4738 Narrot Street Torrance, California 90503 / US | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306715.3 | 23.07.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | US19900563129 | 03.08.1990 Original published format: US 563129 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473281 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01R29/08 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
G01K11/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1992/10] | Title | German: | Passive, tomographische Nahfeld-Mikrowellenabbildungseinrichtung und Methode | [1992/10] | English: | Passive microwave near-field tomographic imaging system and method | [1992/10] | French: | Méthode et dispositif tomographiques d'imagerie passive à microondes en zone de champ proche | [1992/10] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 15.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/16] | 23.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4794395 (CINDRICH IVAN [US], et al); | [AD]WO8505188 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [AP]EP0395863 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) |