EP0470737 - Cache memory operating method and structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | Change - representative | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states NCR CORPORATION World Headquarters Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellis, Jackson L. 700 E Drake Road, No. C5 Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | 02 /
Moussavi, Robert B. 13645 Tiverton Road San Diego, California 92130 / US | 03 /
King, Edward C. 4945 Norris Drive Fremont, California 94536 / US | [1992/07] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1996/24] | Robinson, Robert George, et al International Intellectual Property Department, NCR LIMITED, 915 High Road, North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | ||
Former [1995/02] | Robinson, Robert George, et al International Intellectual Property Department AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS LIMITED 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | ||
Former [1994/44] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | ||
Former [1992/07] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306845.8 | 26.07.1991 | [1992/07] | Priority number, date | US19900563220 | 06.08.1990 Original published format: US 563220 | [1992/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470737 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
G06F12/0804 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/07] | Title | German: | Betriebsverfahren und Struktur eines Cache-Speichers | [1992/07] | English: | Cache memory operating method and structure | [1992/07] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement et structure d'une antémémoire | [1992/07] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/03] | 25.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0310446 (COMPUTER CONSOLES INC [US]); | [Y]US4157586 (GANNON PATRICK M [US], et al) | [Y] - 'intel Advance Information 82385 High Performance 32-bit Cache Controller' October 1987 , INTEL , SANTA CLARA US pages 1-11 |