Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04233103 | Global Dossier | 21.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US55896290 | 27.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0468822 | Global Dossier | 11.03.1992 | A3 | EP0468822 | 29.01.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55896290 | 27.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2047972 | 28.01.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55896290 | 27.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5126923 | 30.06.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US55896290 | 27.07.1990 |