EP0468822 - Omnidirectional light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILLUMITECH, INC. 6314 Eaglebrook Avenue Tampa Florida 33625 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states ILLUMITECH, INC. 6314 Eaglebrook Avenue Tampa, Florida 33625 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hall, William J. 6314 Eaglebrook Avenue Tampa, Florida 33625 / US | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1992/05] | Application number, filing date | 91306890.4 | 26.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | US19900558962 | 27.07.1990 Original published format: US 558962 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0468822 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0468822 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F21Q3/00, B60Q1/26 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
F21S8/083 (EP,US);
B60Q1/2611 (EP,US);
B63B45/04 (EP,US);
F21L4/00 (EP,US);
F21V14/04 (EP,US);
F21V14/045 (EP,US);
F21V7/0008 (EP,US);
F21S10/06 (EP,US);
F21V23/0442 (EP,US);
F21V9/08 (EP,US);
F21V9/083 (EP,US);
F21W2111/00 (EP,US);
F21W2111/02 (EP,US);
F21W2111/04 (EP,US);
F21W2111/047 (EP,US);
F21W2131/103 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/05] | F21Q3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/05] | Title | German: | Rundstrahlleuchte | [1992/05] | English: | Omnidirectional light | [1992/05] | French: | Lampe omnidirectionnelle | [1992/05] | File destroyed: | 01.10.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/20] | 17.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB975583 (MALDON CAVENDISH HARLEY); | [X]US2846663 (HEEHLER ARTHUR C, et al); | [X]US2740103 (GOSSWILLER EARL W); | [X]US4104615 (HUNTER EVEREST C) |