EP0470768 - Scheduling drawing operations of moving images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH MACHINES PLC New Mill House, 183 Milton Park Milton, Abingdon, Oxon OX14 4SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states RESEARCH MACHINES PLC New Hill House, 183 Milton Park Milton, Abingdon, Oxon OX14 4SE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matthews, Anthony John 24 Heytsbury Gardens Grange Park, Swindon, Wilts. SN5 6EE / GB | [1992/07] | Representative(s) | Unwin, Stephen Geoffrey Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Unwin, Stephen Geoffrey S.G. Unwin & Co. Brookfurlong Farmhouse Islip, Oxford OX5 2TJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307077.7 | 01.08.1991 | [1992/07] | Priority number, date | GB19900017491 | 09.08.1990 Original published format: GB 9017491 | [1992/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0470768 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0470768 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470768 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/60, G09G1/16 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
G06T13/00 (EP);
G09G5/393 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/14] | G06F15/72, G09G1/16 | ||
Former IPC [1992/07] | G06F15/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1996/05] |
Former [1992/07] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Planung von Zeichenoperationen von beweglichen Bildern | [1992/07] | English: | Scheduling drawing operations of moving images | [1992/07] | French: | Planification des opérations de dessin d'images animées | [1992/07] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.06.1996 | SE | 12.09.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1997/17] | SE | 12.09.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0254293 ; | [A]EP0283565 |