EP0471481 - BACTERIAL INHIBITING COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETZ EUROPE, INC. 4636 Somerton Road Trevose Pennsylvania 19047 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states BETZ EUROPE, INC. 4636 Somerton Road Trevose Pennsylvania 19047 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitekettle, Wilson Kurt 215 Hampton Hall Lane Conroe, TX 77302 / US | 02 /
Donofrio, Deborah Kalman 112 N. Deerfoot Circle The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | [1992/08] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307093.4 | 01.08.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | US19900566957 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: US 566957 | US19900566958 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: US 566958 | US19900566956 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: US 566956 | US19900566955 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: US 566955 | US19900566953 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: US 566953 | US19900566952 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: US 566952 | US19900566954 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: US 566954 | US19900566951 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: US 566951 | US19900566950 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: US 566950 | [1992/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0471481 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0471481 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471481 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/34, C02F1/50, // (A01N57/34, 59:00, 55:04, 47:44, 43:88, 43:80, 41:08, 35:08) | [1992/08] | CPC: |
C02F1/50 (EP);
A01N57/34 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N57/34, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N57/34, A01N59/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | Bakterienhemmende Zusammensetzungen und deren Verwendung | [1992/08] | English: | BACTERIAL INHIBITING COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR USE | [1992/08] | French: | Compositions inhibitrices des bactéries et leur utilisation | [1992/08] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/36: Teilanmeldung 96201621.8 eingereicht am 11/06/96 | EPB 1996/36: Divisional application 96201621.8 filed on 11/06/96 | EPB 1996/36: Demande divisionnaire 96201621.8 déposée le 11/06/96 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96201621.8 / EP0743002 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.01.1997 | NL | 22.01.1997 | SE | 22.04.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/11] | AT | 22.01.1997 | |
SE | 22.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 22.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US5010066 (DONOFRIO DEBORAH K [US], et al) | [ ] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 225, January 1983, page 4, abstract no. 22520, Havant, Hampshire, GB; CIBA-GEIGY PLC: "Biocide", the whole article. |