Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH05189471 | Global Dossier | 30.07.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US56507990 | 10.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0478128 | Global Dossier | 22.12.1993 | A3 | EP0478128 | 01.04.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US56507990 | 10.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR920004965 | 28.03.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US56507990 | 10.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5038311 | 06.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US56507990 | 10.08.1990 |