EP0478128 - Pipelined fast fourier transform processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monastra, Edward James 6 Gettysburg Drive Voorhees, New Jersey 08043 / US | 02 /
Huah, Jim Jenndong 103 Hart Road Cherry Hill, New Jersey 08034 / US | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/14] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307300.3 | 08.08.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | US19900565079 | 10.08.1990 Original published format: US 565079 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0478128 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0478128 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/332 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
G06F17/142 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/14] | Title | German: | Pipelineprozessor für die schnelle Fourier-Transformation | [1992/14] | English: | Pipelined fast fourier transform processor | [1992/14] | French: | Processeur pipeline de calcul d'une transformation rapide de Fourier | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 22.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/52] | 30.07.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2545629 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | [A]FR2641631 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]EP0262816 (ZORAN CORP [US]); | [A]EP0329023 (HONEYWELL INC [US]); | [A]EP0376683 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [A] - BUNGARD D. R., LAU L., RORABAUGH T. L., "PROGRAMMABLE FFT PROCESSORS FOR WIDE-BANDWIDTH HF SPEAD-SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS AND RADAR SIGNAL PROCESSING.", SPEECH PROCESSING 2, DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING. GLASGOW, MAY 23 - 26, 1989., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19890523), vol. 02., pages 1357 - 1359., XP000090353 |