EP0472351 - Method for the preparation of soluble (CH3)3SiO1/2/SiO2 (M/Q) siloxane resins with amine and amide organofunctionality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/09] | Siloxane soluble (CH3)3SiO1/2/SiO2(M/Q)resins with amine and amide organofunctionality | ||
[1996/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.1997 [1997/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | ||
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Antony Pope 7300 Jefferson Road Rhodes, Michigan / US | 02 /
Varaprath, Padmakumari Janakey 2108 Candelstick Midland, Michigan / US | [1992/09] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1992/09] | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307485.2 | 13.08.1991 | [1992/09] | Priority number, date | US19900570668 | 22.08.1990 Original published format: US 570668 | [1992/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0472351 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0472351 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0472351 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/388, C08G77/26, C09J183/08, C09D183/08, C09D151/08 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
C09D4/06 (EP,US);
C07F7/10 (EP,US);
C08F299/08 (EP,US);
C08G77/26 (EP,US);
C08G77/388 (EP,US);
C09D155/005 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D4/06, C08F290/068 (US,EP);
C09D4/06, C08F290/148 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung löslicher MQ-Polysiloxanharze mit (CH3)3SiO1/2- und SiO2-Kettensegmenten und organofunktionellen Amin- und Amidgruppen | [1996/32] | English: | Method for the preparation of soluble (CH3)3SiO1/2/SiO2 (M/Q) siloxane resins with amine and amide organofunctionality | [1996/32] | French: | Méthode de préparation de résines solubles à base de polysiloxanes MQ ayant des unités (CH)3SiO1/2 et SiO2 et ayant des groupes fonctionnels amine et amide | [1996/32] |
Former [1992/09] | Lösliche MQ-Polysiloxanharze mit (CH3)3SiO1/2- und SiO2-Kettensegmenten und organofunktionellen Amin- und Amidgruppen | ||
Former [1992/09] | Siloxane soluble (CH3)3SiO1/2/SiO2(M/Q)resins with amine and amide organofunctionality | ||
Former [1992/09] | Résines solubles à base de polysiloxanes MQ ayant des unités (CH)3SiO1/2 et SiO2 et ayant des groupes fonctionnels amine et amide | Examination procedure | 22.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 21.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3902483 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [YP]EP0396246 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [YD]US4608270 (VARAPRATH PADMAKUMARI J [US]) | Examination | EP0161888 |