EP0490467 - Ultra-lightweight camouflage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRUNSWICK CORPORATION One Brunswick Plaza Skokie Illinois 60077 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states BRUNSWICK CORPORATION One Brunswick Plaza Skokie Illinois 60077 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parks, Dewey P. 931 Lexington Road Deland, Florida 32720 / US | 02 /
Knox, Daniel H. 414 South Boundary Avenue Deland, Florida 32720 / US | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307592.5 | 16.08.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | US19900623780 | 07.12.1990 Original published format: US 623780 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0490467 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0490467 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, B32B7/08, B32B31/12, F41H3/02 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B37/144 (EP);
B32B37/24 (EP);
F41H3/02 (EP);
B32B2305/08 (US);
B32B2327/06 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Ultraleichte Tarnung | [1992/25] | English: | Ultra-lightweight camouflage | [1992/25] | French: | Camouflage ultra-léger | [1992/25] | File destroyed: | 27.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 14.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/02] | 06.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4931320 (LEONARD ROBERT R [US]); | [Y]FR2334080 (BARRACUDAVERKEN AB [SE]); | [Y]US4243709 (MORTON KENNETH I); | [A]US3069796 (RUTER RUDOLF G, et al); | [A]US3733606 (JOHANSSON S) | [Y] - KUNSTSTOFFBERATER vol. 33, no. 1-2, February 1988, ISERNHAGEN (HANNOVER), W.GERMANY pages 39 - 42 HANS-D. PATERMANN 'Technologie der Rakel-, Siebkopf-und Walzenauftragssysteme' |