EP0471590 - Thermal shock and creep resistant porous mullite articles prepared from topaz and process for manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.08.1995 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION Menlo Park, CN 40 Edison New Jersey 08818 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION Menlo Park, CN 40 Edison New Jersey 08818 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yavuz, Bulent O. 1340 Marlborough Avenue Plainfield, NJ 07060 / US | 02 /
Voss, Kenneth E. 351 Colonial Road Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | 03 /
Larkin, Matthew P. 293 Morris Street Philipsburg, NJ 08865 / US | 04 /
Rice, Gary W. 1221 Raritan Road Scotch Plains, NJ 07076 / US | [1992/08] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307597.4 | 16.08.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | US19900567995 | 16.08.1990 Original published format: US 567995 | US19910727207 | 09.07.1991 Original published format: US 727207 | [1992/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471590 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/18, C01B33/26 | [1992/08] | CPC: |
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
C01B33/26 (EP,US);
C04B35/185 (EP,US);
C04B35/636 (EP,US);
C04B35/6365 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | Gegen Wärmestoss und Kriechen beständige poröse Gegenstände aus Mullit, hergestellt aus Topaz und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1992/08] | English: | Thermal shock and creep resistant porous mullite articles prepared from topaz and process for manufacture | [1992/08] | French: | Articles de mullite poreux avec résistance au choc thermique et fluage à partir de topage et procédé pour leur fabrication | [1992/08] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/39] | 14.05.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU893957 ; | [A]JP1212299 ; | [AD]WO9001471 (US HEALTH [US]); | [A]EP0187007 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]); | [A]US4910172 (TALMY INNA G [US], et al); | [A]US4735925 (KATO TAKASHI [JP], et al) | [A] - DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD.,LONDON,GB WORLD PATENTS INDEX (LATEST) ACCESSION NUMBER 82-94578E &SU-A-893957(BELGOROD CONS MATLS) (30-12-1981), & SU893957 A 00000000 | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX (LATEST) ACCESSION NUMBER 89-289284 (WEEK 8940) DERWENT PUBLICATIONS, LONDON, GB; & JP-A-1 212 299 (KIYOSHI OKADA) 17-02-1988, & JP1212299 A 00000000 |