Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0528085
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.10.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] |
30.09.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.06.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.08.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
13.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.04.2002 |
First examination report |
|
22.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.10.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
28.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.01.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] |
31.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.04.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] |
28.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.08.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.08.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.04.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] |
08.01.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] |