Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3302409B | Global Dossier | 15.07.2002 | B2 | JPH05227197 | 03.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP91307635 | 19.08.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0528085 | Global Dossier | 24.02.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91307635 | 19.08.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5301189 | 05.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP91307635 | 19.08.1991 |