EP0475630 - Software reconfigurable transmission line apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Algiere, John L. 1209 Tupelo Dr. Loveland, Colorado 80538 / JP | 02 /
Sesnic, Tom T. 4501 Boardwalk Dr., Apt. G60 Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / JP | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307847.3 | 28.08.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | US19900582264 | 12.09.1990 Original published format: US 582264 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0475630 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0475630 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0475630 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01P3/08, H01P1/10 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
H01P1/10 (EP,US);
H05K1/0218 (EP,US);
H05K1/0237 (EP,US);
H05K1/0298 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/12] | H01P1/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/12] | Title | German: | Mittels Software rekonfigurierbare Übertragungsleitungsvorrichtung | [1992/12] | English: | Software reconfigurable transmission line apparatus | [1992/12] | French: | Dispositif à lignes de transmission reconfigurable par logiciel | [1992/12] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3568000 (ABOVILLE FRANCOIS REGIS D, et al); | [A]EP0040067 (JUNKOSHA CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4928022 (MARUM JOHN R [US]) | [A] - JAEU; JOURNAL OF THE ASIA ELECTRONICS UNION vol. 6, no. 1, 1973, TOKYO, JP pages 36 - 39 PAL, SURENDRA ET AL. 'Coupled Microstrip Transmission Line - Even and Odd Mode Characteristic Impedance Calculations' |