EP0505638 - Antimicrobial composition having resistance to heat and weather [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hagiwara Research Corporation 3-2 Hashioka-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | For all designated states JAPAN ELECTRONICS MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-13, Nishinagasu-cho 2-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states Hagiwara Research Corporation 3-2 Hashioka-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states JAPAN ELECTRONICS MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-13, Nishinagasu-cho 2-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagiwara, Zenji 3-2, Hashioka-cho Kusatsu-shi, Shiga-ken / JP | 02 /
Okubo, Masao 14-46-503, Takakura-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1992/40] | Cropp, John Anthony David MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307870.5 | 28.08.1991 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | JP19910058956 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: JP 5895691 | [1992/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505638 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505638 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/16, A01N59/20 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
C08K9/12 (EP,US);
A01N59/16 (EP,US);
A01N59/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/16, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/16, A01N59/16, A01N25/34, A01N25/26, A01N25/08 (US,EP);
A01N59/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/20, A01N25/34, A01N25/26, A01N25/08 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/40] | Title | German: | Antimikrobielle Zusammensetzung mit einer Hitze- und Witterungsbeständigkeit | [1992/40] | English: | Antimicrobial composition having resistance to heat and weather | [1992/40] | French: | Composition antimicrobienne ayant une résistance à la chaleur et aux intempéries | [1992/40] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 03.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2273591 ; | [A]EP0116865 (KANEBO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0235431 (HAGIWARA RESEARCH CORP [JP], et al); | [A]EP0251783 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0253663 (HAGIWARA ZENJI [JP], et al) | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Week 9051, 8 November 1990 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 90-379437 & JP-A-2 273 591 (SHIZEN KK), & JP2273591 A 19901108 | Examination | EP0444939 |