EP0478156 - Blind for vehicle opening roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Britax Weathershields Limited 180 Sherlock Street Birmingham B5 7EH / GB | [1992/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, Paul Geoffrey 7 Kilcote Road, Solihull Lodge, Shirley Solihull, West Midlands B90 1NR / GB | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Hollinghurst, Antony Britax Childcare Limited 1 Churchill Way West Andover Hampshire SP10 3UW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Hollinghurst, Antony B.S.G. International plc Patent Department Castle Trading Estate East Street Portchester, Hants PO16 9SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308020.6 | 02.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | GB19900019696 | 08.09.1990 Original published format: GB 9019696 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0478156 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0478156 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/00 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
B60J7/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/14] | Title | German: | Sonnenschutzblende für Fahrzeugsonnendach | [1992/14] | English: | Blind for vehicle opening roof | [1992/14] | French: | Ecran pour toit ouvrant de véhicule | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0164532 ; | [A]EP0237759 |