EP0474477 - Centrifugal pumping apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION 29600 Noormarkku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION FIN-29600 Noormarkku / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vesala, Reijo Lohniementie, 29 SF-48300 Kotka / FI | 02 /
Vikman, Vesa 11 Piiri, Riihikallio SF-48720 Kymi / FI | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn, et al Forresters 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn, et al POTTS, KERR & CO. 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308101.4 | 04.09.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | US19900579406 | 07.09.1990 Original published format: US 579406 | [1992/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0474477 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0474477 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F04D7/04 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
F04D7/045 (EP,US);
F05B2210/132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1992/11] | Title | German: | Zentrifugalpumpe | [1992/11] | English: | Centrifugal pumping apparatus | [1992/11] | French: | Dispositif de pompage centrifuge | [1992/11] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/01] | 05.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR852435 (BURCKHARDT AG MASCHF); | [A]US3944406 (JAGUSCH LEONHARD, et al); | [A]EP0298949 (KAMYR AB [SE]) |