EP0475780 - Apparatus for obtaining recharge codes for postage meters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/12] | Apparatus for recharging one or more postage meters | ||
[1996/21] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES, INC. World Headquarters Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES, INC. World Headquarters Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyung-Kun P. 39, Friendlee Lane Wilton, Connecticut 06897 / US | 02 /
Axelrod, Barry H. 217, Sterling Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | 03 /
Zuidema, Eric L. 4, Kendall Court Norwalk, Connecticut 06850 / US | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Avery, Stephen John, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Avery, Stephen John, et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/12] | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308384.6 | 13.09.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | US19900582047 | 13.09.1990 Original published format: US 582047 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0475780 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0475780 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0475780 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/02 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
G07B17/0008 (EP);
G07B2017/00137 (EP);
G07B2017/00161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1992/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Empfangen von Aufladecodes für Frankiermaschinen | [1996/21] | English: | Apparatus for obtaining recharge codes for postage meters | [1996/21] | French: | Dispositif pour obtenir des codes de recharge pour des machines à affranchir | [1996/21] |
Former [1992/12] | Apparat zum Nachladen einer oder mehrerer Frankiermaschinen | ||
Former [1992/12] | Apparatus for recharging one or more postage meters | ||
Former [1992/12] | Appareil pour recharger une ou plusieurs machines d'affranchissement | Examination procedure | 21.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 22.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.1997
03.12.2001
WITHDRAWN Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. KG Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Santarelli, Luc Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | 02
24.02.1997
24.03.1997
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.1997
03.12.2001
WITHDRAWN Francotyp Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. KG Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Santarelli, Luc Cabinet Rinuy Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
02
24.02.1997
24.03.1997
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | |||
Former [2002/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.1997
03.12.2001
WITHDRAWN Francotyp Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. KG Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Santarelli, Luc Cabinet Rinuy Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
02
24.02.1997
24.03.1997
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | |||
Former [1997/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.1997
Société SECAP 21, rue Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli, Luc Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
02
24.02.1997
Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | 24.04.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.10.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.03.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.05.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/32] | Appeal following opposition | 19.07.1999 | Appeal received No. T0763/99 | 13.09.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.06.2002 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 18.06.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 08.05.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0298776 ; | [YD]US4812992 ; | [A]GB2185443 ; | [A]US4097923 ; | [A]GB2080202 | Examination | GB2080203 |