EP0481603 - Separation of weak organic acids from liquid mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morohashi, Masayuki 5344-649 Gonda, Kurabuchi-Mura Gunma-Gun, Gunma-ken 370-34 / JP | 02 /
Dhingra, Yog Raj 6101 Sturgeon Creek, Parkway, Midland Michigan 48640 / US | 03 /
Lindy, Lowell B. 4516 Linden Drive, Midland Michigan 48640 / US | 04 /
Norman, Seth I. 5006 Barto, Midland Michigan 48640 / US | 05 /
Gisch, Daryl J. 4911 Sturgeon Creek, Parkway, Midland Michigan 48640 / US | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308501.5 | 18.09.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | US19900597947 | 15.10.1990 Original published format: US 597947 | [1992/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481603 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01J41/04, B01J41/14, C13D3/14 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
B01J41/07 (EP);
B01J41/14 (EP);
C13B20/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1992/17] | Title | German: | Trennung von organischen schwachen Säuren von Flüssigkeitsmischungen | [1992/17] | English: | Separation of weak organic acids from liquid mixtures | [1992/17] | French: | Séparation d'acides organiques faibles de mélanges de liquides | [1992/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 06.04.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8908718 ; | [A]US3982956 ; | [A]FR2307039 ; | [A]EP0167957 ; | [A]US4871397 ; | [A]US3153049 ; | [XD]US4564644 |