EP0478213 - Cordless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GPT LIMITED New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | [1992/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Webster, Geoffrey 48 John Mcguire Crescent Coventry CV3 2QG / GB | 02 /
Heaton, Julian Charles 18 Belgrave Drive Brownsover East, Rugby CV21 1TJ / GB | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Wood, John Irwin The General Electric Company plc GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1992/27] |
Former [1992/14] | Branfield, Henry Anthony The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308504.9 | 18.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | GB19900020964 | 26.09.1990 Original published format: GB 9020964 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0478213 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0478213 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/04, H04B7/26, G08B3/10 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
H04W84/022 (EP);
H04M1/72505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/14] | Title | German: | Schnurloses Kommunikationssystem | [1992/14] | English: | Cordless communication system | [1992/14] | French: | Système de communication sans fil | [1992/14] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 01.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/44] | 08.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.1994 | 30.09.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1185034 ; | [X]EP0030708 (WIRTH ROLAND DIPL ING); | [X]DE3329267 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]EP0212761 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al); | [A]EP0297366 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [XP]GB2234649 (STC PLC [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 470 (E-835)24 October 1989 & JP-A-11 85 034 ( NTT ), & JP1185034 A 19891024 |