blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0482756

EP0482756 - Wideband dual polarized multi-mode antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.05.1998
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.07.1998 [1998/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW INC.
1900 Richmond Road Cleveland
Ohio 44124 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/18]For all designated states
TRW INC.
1900 Richmond Road
Cleveland Ohio 44124 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Walter, Carlton Harry
13208 Tining Drive
Poway, California 92064 / US
02 / Campbell, Donn van Dyke
15844 Bent Tree Road
Poway, California 92064 / US
[1992/18]
Representative(s)Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al
A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/18]Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date91308547.819.09.1991
[1992/18]
Priority number, dateUS1990060258124.10.1990         Original published format: US 602581
[1992/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0482756
Date:29.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0482756
Date:16.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0482756
Date:23.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.1992
ClassificationIPC:H01Q25/04, H01Q1/36, H01Q21/24, H01Q9/27
[1992/51]
CPC:
H01Q11/105 (EP,US); H01Q1/36 (EP,US); H01Q21/24 (EP,US);
H01Q25/04 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1992/18]H01Q25/04, H01Q1/36, H01Q21/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/18]
TitleGerman:Breitbandige, dualpolarizierte Mehrmodenantenne[1992/18]
English:Wideband dual polarized multi-mode antenna[1992/18]
French:Antenne multimode à large bande et à double polarisation[1992/18]
Examination procedure11.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/28]
21.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.01.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.1997Fee for grant paid
03.04.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.04.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchJP6179305  [ ];
 [XP]EP0393875  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]);
 [A]EP0198578  (HAMEL RAYMOND HORACE DU)
 [X]  - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION vol. 19, no. 1, January 1971, NEW YORK, US pages 90 - 96 DESCHAMPS, G.A. ET AL. 'The Logarithmic Spiral in a Single-Aperture Multimode Antenna System.'
 [Y]  - 1990 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEEE vol. 1, May 1990, NEW YORK, US pages 522 - 525 HOFER ET AL. 'A Compact Multi-Polarized Broadband Antenna.'
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 251 (E-432)(2307) 28 August 1986 & JP-A-61 79 305 ( TECH RES & DEV INST OF JAPAN DEF AGENCY ) 22 April 1986, & JP6179305 A 19860422
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.