EP0482771 - Heterocyclic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeneca Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | ||
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, 9 Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faull, Alan Wellington 8 West Close Bollington, Nr Macclesfield, Cheshire / GB | 02 /
Russell, Keith 26 Tysons Ford Road Newark DE19711 / US | 03 /
Watkins, William John 6 Oak Lane Marton Heath, Nr Macclesfield, Cheshire / GB | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Smith, Stephen Collyer, et al Intellectual Property Department ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Smith, Stephen Collyer, et al Intellectual Property Department ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | ||
Former [1992/18] | Hay, Martin Alexander, et al Legal Dept: Patents, PO Box 6, Shire Park, Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308805.0 | 26.09.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | GB19900021571 | 04.10.1990 Original published format: GB 9021571 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0482771 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0482771 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482771 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04, C07D405/04, A61K31/415, A61K31/425, C07D263/26 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D263/26 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/18] | C07D417/04, C07D405/04, A61K31/415, A61K31/425 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/18] | Title | German: | Heterozyklische Säuren | [1992/18] | English: | Heterocyclic acids | [1992/18] | French: | Acides hétérocycliques | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 09.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/24] | Request for further processing for: | 10.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 10.10.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.11.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0329360 (ICI PLC [GB]) |