EP0478364 - Connector device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
CONNECTOR SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY N.V. Julianaplein 22 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | For:DE
FR
NL
CH
LI
IT
BE
ES
BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V. Helftheuvelweg 11 5222 AV s'-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For:GB
CONNECTOR SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY N.V. Julianaplein 22 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | ||
For:DE
FR
NL
CH
LI
IT
BE
ES
BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V. Helftheuvelweg 11 NL-5222 AV s'-Hertogenbosch / NL | |||
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states CONNECTOR SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY N.V. Julianaplein 22 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | ||
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Mon Shing 10, 84 Alley, 207, Lane Show-Tsai Rd. Yung-May, Taoyuan / TW | 02 /
Chen, Chou Lin 126, Wen-Kan Street Taoyuan / TW | 03 /
Hsu, Li-Chang 5F, No. 19, 158 Lane, Sun-Gwan Rd. Chung-Li / TW | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308852.2 | 27.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | JP19900260313 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: JP 26031390 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0478364 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0478364 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/68 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
H01R12/721 (EP);
H05K7/04 (KR);
H01R12/83 (EP);
H01R12/7005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/14] | Title | German: | Verbindereinrichtung | [1992/14] | English: | Connector device | [1992/14] | French: | Dispositif de connecteur | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.05.1996 | CH | 29.05.1996 | ES | 29.05.1996 | IT | 29.05.1996 | LI | 29.05.1996 | NL | 29.05.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 29.05.1996 | |
CH | 29.05.1996 | ||
ES | 29.05.1996 | ||
IT | 29.05.1996 | ||
LI | 29.05.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 29.05.1996 | |
CH | 29.05.1996 | ||
IT | 29.05.1996 | ||
LI | 29.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | BE | 29.05.1996 | |
CH | 29.05.1996 | ||
LI | 29.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | CH | 29.05.1996 | |
LI | 29.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4713022 (PFAFF WAYNE K [US]); | [A]EP0379176 (BURNDY CORP [US], et al); | [A]GB887101 (ASS ELECT IND) |