EP0479550 - Focus detection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Utagawa, Ken 634-1-161 Noba-cho, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308976.9 | 01.10.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | JP19900263393 | 01.10.1990 Original published format: JP 26339390 | JP19910078652 | 18.03.1991 Original published format: JP 7865291 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0479550 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0479550 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479550 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/34 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
G02B7/346 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/15] | Title | German: | Fokusdetektor | [1992/15] | English: | Focus detection apparatus | [1992/15] | French: | Dispositif de détection de mise au point | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 05.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/01] | Request for further processing for: | 20.09.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4949116 (KARASAKI TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US4904854 (ISHIDA TOKUJI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0351855 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3803305 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | US4954701 |