EP0479594 - Form-fill-seal type packaging machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIDA CO., Ltd. 44 Shogoin-Sannocho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states ISHIDA CO., Ltd. 44 Shogoin-Sannocho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | ||
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states ISHIDA SCALES MFG. CO., LTD. 44 Sanno-cho, Shogoin, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Masao 326-144, Ooaza-Bodaiji Kosei-cho Koga-gun, Shiga / JP | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91309085.8 | 03.10.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | JP19900268653 | 05.10.1990 Original published format: JP 26865390 | JP19910198863 | 12.07.1991 Original published format: JP 19886391 | JP19910204084 | 14.08.1991 Original published format: JP 20408491 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0479594 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0479594 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479594 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/20, B65H23/038, B65H23/32, B65H19/12 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
B65B9/20 (EP,US);
B65B41/16 (EP,US);
B65B57/00 (EP);
B65H23/038 (EP,US);
B65H2801/69 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/15] | B65B9/20, B65H23/038 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/15] | Title | German: | Verpackungsmaschine des Typs Formen-Füllen-Schliessen | [1992/15] | English: | Form-fill-seal type packaging machine | [1992/15] | French: | Machine d'emballage de type formation-remplissage-scellement | [1992/15] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/21: Teilanmeldung 94107273.8 eingereicht am 03/10/91 | EPB 1995/21: Divisional application 94107273.8 filed on 03/10/91 | EPB 1995/21: Demande divisionnaire 94107273.8 déposée le 03/10/91 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | EP94107273.8 / EP0618136 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Request for further processing for: | 26.01.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3373288 [ ] (OTEPKA RUDOLPH T, et al); | US3680446 [ ] (JAMES ROBERT C, et al) | Examination | DE1586118 | DE2616852 | GB2070575 | GB2097356 | FR2509704 | DE3334879 | EP0260453 |