EP0480766 - Subsea connection system and a mobile connector utilized in said system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PETRÓLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. - PETROBRAS Avenida Republica do Chile, 65 Rio de Janeiro / BR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. - PETROBRAS Avenida Republica do Chile, 65 Rio de Janeiro / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paulo, Cezar Augusto Silva Rua Das Azeléas, no 406 Rio de Janeiro / BR | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91309403.3 | 11.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | BR19909005132 | 12.10.1990 Original published format: BR 9005132 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480766 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480766 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16L1/12, F16L37/12 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
E21B43/013 (EP,US);
F16L37/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1992/16] | Title | German: | Unterwasserverbindungssystem und bewegliche Verbindungseinrichtung für dieses System | [1992/16] | English: | Subsea connection system and a mobile connector utilized in said system | [1992/16] | French: | Système de connexion sous marine et un connecteur pour le même système | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 25.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4730853 (GJESSING HARALD [NO]); | [A]DE3707348 (RICHE ROBERT [FR]); | [A]EP0296137 (KVAERNER SUBSEA CONTRACTING [NO]) |