EP0481739 - Method of and apparatus for opening a folded web of heat-sealable packaging material prior to formation of the web into sealed reclosable packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.1993 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAYSSEN MANUFACTURING COMPANY P.O.Box 571 Sheboygan Wisconsin 53081-0571 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states HAYSSEN MANUFACTURING COMPANY P.O.Box 571 Sheboygan Wisconsin 53081-0571 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
James, Robert C. Post Office Box 571 Sheboygan, Wisconsin 53081-0571 / US | 02 /
Kovacs, Lloyd Post Office Box 571 Sheboygan, Wisconsin 53081-0571 / US | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91309503.0 | 16.10.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | US19900598045 | 16.10.1990 Original published format: US 598045 | [1992/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481739 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/10, B65B61/18 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
B65B61/188 (EP,US);
B65B41/16 (EP,US);
B65B9/20 (EP,US);
B65B9/207 (EP,US);
Y10S493/927 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Öffnen einer aus heissiegelbarem Material gefalteten Bahn, vor dem Herstellen von wiederschliessbaren Verpackungen aus dem Bahnmaterial | [1992/17] | English: | Method of and apparatus for opening a folded web of heat-sealable packaging material prior to formation of the web into sealed reclosable packages | [1992/17] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour l'ouverture d'une bande de matériau thermoscellable pliée avant formation de la bande en emballages refermables | [1992/17] | File destroyed: | 17.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/24] | 22.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US5027584 (MCMAHON MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [XP]US5014498 (MCMAHON MICHAEL J [US]); | [A]US4625496 (AUSNIT STEVEN [US]); | [A]US4941307 (WOJCIK JOHN [US]); | [A]US4727709 (ZIEKE LARRY M [US], et al) |