Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] |
14.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
13.02.1996 | Examination report or reply | |
03.10.1995 | First examination report | |
24.11.1993 | Publication of search report | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] |
13.03.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] |
13.03.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] |