EP0482953 - Method of and system for data communication in communication network on automobile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimotsuma, Hiroshi, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Kawagoe Works, 25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Gou, Yasunao, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Kawagoe Works, 25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Ikata, Yoshikatsu, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Kawagoe Works, 25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Kimura, Toshiyuki, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Kawagoe Works, 25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91309898.4 | 25.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | JP19900288220 | 25.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28822090 | JP19900288224 | 25.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28822490 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0482953 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0482953 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482953 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
B60R16/0315 (EP,US);
B60R2016/0322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Datenübertragung in einem Übertragungsnetz in Kraftfahrzeugen | [1995/51] | English: | Method of and system for data communication in communication network on automobile | [1992/18] | French: | Méthode et système pour la communication de données dans un réseau de communication d'une automobile | [1992/18] |
Former [1992/18] | Verfahren und System zur Datenübertragung in einem Kraftfahrzeugübertragungsnetz | Examination procedure | 09.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4745596 (SATO MORIO [JP]); | [A]EP0367177 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) | [A] - INGENIEURS DE L` AUTOMOBILE no. 8, November 1984, PARIS pages 67 - 70 HERVE BENOIT 'LES BUS D2B ET I2C ET LEUR APPLICATION EN AUTOMOBILE' |