EP0484163 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirai, Toshiyuki Rapolu No. 772, 2613-1, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Kozaki, Shuichi 51-303, 2-1-2, Ukyo Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Funada, Fumiaki 33-10, Izumihara-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310091.3 | 31.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | JP19900296263 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: JP 29626390 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0484163 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0484163 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484163 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/00, G02F1/1333 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
C09K19/544 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/19] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung | [1992/19] | English: | Liquid crystal display device | [1992/19] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [1992/19] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4101207 ; | [Y]EP0272585 ; | [Y]EP0362776 ; | [A]EP0304153 |