EP0484178 - Glass door or partition support rail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORALCO, INC 11690 S. Cicero Avenue Alsip, Illinois 60658-2816 / US | [1997/18] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states DORALCO, INC 12601 South Springfield Alsip, Illinois 60658 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trainor, Robert J., Jr. 15637 Plumtree Drive Orland Park, Illinois 60462 / US | 02 /
Bardo, Samuel B. 15737 CR4 Bristol, Indiana 46507 / US | 03 /
Leonard, David A. 3013 201st Place Lynwood, Illinois 60411 / US | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Godwin, Edgar James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1995/45] | Mounteney, Simon James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1992/19] | Lawson, David Glynne MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310133.3 | 01.11.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | US19900607888 | 01.11.1990 Original published format: US 607888 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484178 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484178 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/02 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
E04B2/825 (EP,US);
E06B3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1992/32] |
Former [1992/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Tragschiene für eine gläserne Tür oder Trennwand | [1992/19] | English: | Glass door or partition support rail | [1992/19] | French: | Rail de support pour porte ou paroi de séparation en verre | [1992/19] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU | 06.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 30.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.01.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.01.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL97057C ; | [A]CH430146 (TEMPERIT AG [CH]); | [A]DE2156954 (VER BAUBESCHLAG GRETSCH CO); | [A]US4914888 (HANSON LAURENCE B [US]) |