EP0486216 - Light-sensitive silver halide photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimura, Motoi Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sato, Hirokazu Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium 1 Eversholt Street London NW1 2DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1992/21] | Brock, Peter William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310285.1 | 06.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | JP19900305539 | 10.11.1990 Original published format: JP 30553990 | [1992/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486216 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486216 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/392 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
G03C7/39208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1998/11] |
Former [1992/21] | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Photographisches lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial | [1992/21] | English: | Light-sensitive silver halide photographic material | [1992/21] | French: | Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 13.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0234783 ; | [Y]EP0384393 | Examination | EP0457543 |