EP0503193 - Sealed power clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTM CORPORATION 300 Davis Road Marysville Michigan 48040 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states BTM CORPORATION 300 Davis Road Marysville, Michigan 48040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawdon, Edwin George 722 North Riverside St Clair, Michigan 48079 / US | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Williams, Trevor John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1992/38] | Application number, filing date | 91310292.7 | 06.11.1991 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | US19910667504 | 11.03.1991 Original published format: US 667504 | [1992/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0503193 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0503193 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/06, B25B5/04 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
B25B5/061 (EP,US);
B25B5/122 (EP,US);
B25B5/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | Abgeschlossene Klemme mit Kraftbetrieb | [1992/38] | English: | Sealed power clamp | [1992/38] | French: | Crampon mécanique scellé | [1992/38] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 26.10.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2588494 (RENAULT AUTOMATION [FR]); | [A]FR2296494 (CAREL FOUCHE LANGUEPIN [FR]); | [A]EP0293755 (STA CO METTALLERZEUGNISSE GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4494739 (VALENTINE AL L [US]); | [A]FR2340798 (POLYMATIC SA [FR]); | [A]EP0235571 (STA CO METTALLERZEUGNISSE GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB1413751 (TUENKERS GMBH) |