EP0490488 - A carrier for projecting articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BPB PAPER & PACKAGING LIMITED Merton Containers, Glandwr Industrial Estate Aberbeeg Gwent Wales NP32 2LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states BPB PAPER & PACKAGING LIMITED Merton Containers, Glandwr Industrial Estate Aberbeeg, Gwent Wales NP32 2LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winterborn, K. 29 Ty Gwyn, Little Mill Nr Pontypool, Gwent NP4 OHU / GB | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1992/25] | Ford, Michael Frederick MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310447.7 | 13.11.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | GB19900026627 | 07.12.1990 Original published format: GB 9026627 | GB19910000263 | 07.01.1991 Original published format: GB 9100263 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490488 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490488 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47G7/02, B65D5/26 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
A01G9/088 (EP);
A47G23/0641 (EP);
B65D71/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/25] | Title | German: | Tragbehälter für hervorstehende Gegenstände | [1992/25] | English: | A carrier for projecting articles | [1992/25] | French: | Dispositif de transport pour des articles saillants | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 12.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8231691U ; | [A]FR943534 ; | [A]DE8707860U ; | [A]US4209945 |