EP0486289 - Biological process for producing alpha-hydroxyamide or alpha-hydroxy acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. No. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endo, Takakazu, c/o Nitto Chemical Ind.Co., Ltd. 10-1 Daikoku-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Yamagami, Tomohide 225-2, Uchiage Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Tamura, Koji, c/o Nitto Chemical Ind.Co., Ltd. 10-1 Daikoku-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Anthony Richmond Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310490.7 | 13.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | JP19900308269 | 14.11.1990 Original published format: JP 30826990 | [1992/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0486289 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0486289 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486289 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/42, C12P13/02, C12P41/00 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
C12P13/02 (EP,US);
C12P41/006 (EP,US);
C12P7/42 (EP,US);
Y10S435/822 (EP,US);
Y10S435/823 (EP,US);
Y10S435/829 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/08] | C12P7/42, C12P13/02, C12P41/00, C12P7/40, C12P13/00, C12P7/56 | ||
Former IPC [1992/21] | C12P7/42, C12P13/02, C12P41/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/21] | Title | German: | Biologisches Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alpha-Hydroxyamid und Alpha-Hydroxysäure | [1992/21] | English: | Biological process for producing alpha-hydroxyamide or alpha-hydroxy acid | [1992/21] | French: | Procédé biologique pour la production d'un alpha-hydroxyamide ou d'un acide alpha hydroxylé | [1992/21] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 20.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 30.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP61056086 ; | [A]FR2245585 (ANVAR [FR]); | [A]FR2294999 (ANVAR [FR]); | [A]EP0348901 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 7, 18 August 1986, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 59481x, KAWAKAMI, KYOSHI ET AL: "Microbial production of alpha hydroxy acid and its salts", page 518; & JP-A-61 056 086 (ASAHI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY) 20 March 1986, & JP61056086 A 19860320 |