EP0486308 - Coated abrasive having an overcoating of an epoxy resin coatable from water and a grinding aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Chong S., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Buchanan, Scott J., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/21] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91310533.4 | 14.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | US19900610701 | 14.11.1990 Original published format: US 610701 | [1992/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0486308 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0486308 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486308 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/34 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
B24D3/28 (EP,US);
B24D3/344 (EP,US);
C09K3/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | Mit einer wässerigen Epoxyüberschicht und einem Schleifzusatz überzogener Schleifkörper | [1992/21] | English: | Coated abrasive having an overcoating of an epoxy resin coatable from water and a grinding aid | [1992/21] | French: | Abrasif revêtu avec une couche superficielle en résine epoxy base aqueuse et un additif de polissage | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.07.1995 | SE | 12.10.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2000/27] | SE | 12.10.1995 | |
NL | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 12.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2657881 (SIA SCHWEIZER SCHMIRGEL & SCHL); | [Y]EP0284064 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [AP]EP0398580 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) |