EP0487263 - Deodorizing apparatus and a toilet provided with the apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1992/40] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3-6 Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aibe, Toshio 6-12 Honmachi 5-chome Toyonaka, Osaka 560 / JP | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Laredo, Jack Joseph Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310563.1 | 15.11.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | JP19900314975 | 19.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31497590 | JP19910198558 | 12.07.1991 Original published format: JP 19855891 | [1992/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0487263 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0487263 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487263 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/052 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
E03D9/052 (EP,US);
A61L9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/22] | Title | German: | Deodoriervorrichtung und Toilette versehen mit der Vorrichtung | [1992/22] | English: | Deodorizing apparatus and a toilet provided with the apparatus | [1992/22] | French: | Désodorisateur et toilettes équipées du dispositif | [1992/22] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.1996 | BE | 21.02.1996 | CH | 21.02.1996 | DK | 21.02.1996 | ES | 21.02.1996 | GR | 21.02.1996 | LI | 21.02.1996 | NL | 21.02.1996 | SE | 21.05.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 21.02.1996 | |
BE | 21.02.1996 | ||
CH | 21.02.1996 | ||
DK | 21.02.1996 | ||
ES | 21.02.1996 | ||
GR | 21.02.1996 | ||
LI | 21.02.1996 | ||
SE | 21.05.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 21.02.1996 | |
BE | 21.02.1996 | ||
CH | 21.02.1996 | ||
DK | 21.02.1996 | ||
GR | 21.02.1996 | ||
LI | 21.02.1996 | ||
SE | 21.05.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 21.02.1996 | |
BE | 21.02.1996 | ||
CH | 21.02.1996 | ||
DK | 21.02.1996 | ||
LI | 21.02.1996 | ||
SE | 21.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 21.02.1996 | |
BE | 21.02.1996 | ||
CH | 21.02.1996 | ||
LI | 21.02.1996 | ||
SE | 21.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | AT | 21.02.1996 | |
BE | 21.02.1996 | ||
SE | 21.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 21.02.1996 | |
SE | 21.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59227704 ; | [A]JP54002288 ; | [YD]US4317242 (STAMPER ROBIN H); | [Y]BE902160 (KROLS JAN); | [X]EP0331192 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 96 25 April 1985 & JP-A-59 227 704 ( KIYOUSERA KK. ) 21 December 1984, & JP59227704 A 19841221 | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX Week 7907, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 79-12906B & JP-A-54 002 288 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELEC. LTD.) 9 January 1979, & JP54002288 A 19790109 |