EP0488573 - Method of forming superconductive articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1992/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LoIacono, Dominic N. 1015 High Mountain Road Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | 02 /
Plewes, John Travis 4 Stonegate Court Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310676.1 | 20.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | US19900620975 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: US 620975 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0488573 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0488573 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0488573 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24, H01L39/14 | [1992/45] | CPC: |
H10N60/0801 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/23] | H01L39/14, H01L39/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines supraleitenden Artikels | [1992/23] | English: | Method of forming superconductive articles | [1992/23] | French: | Méthode pour former des articles supraconducteurs | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 05.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0281474 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]EP0285319 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]AT388393B (PLANSEE METALLWERK [AT]) |