EP0519137 - Optical/electrical transceiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALIBER MEDICAL CORPORATION 230 Edison Way Reno Nevada 89502 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states CALIBER MEDICAL CORPORATION 230 Edison Way Reno, Nevada 89502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bible, Christopher T. 2352 Melody Lane Reno, Nevada 89512 / US | 02 /
Middle, George H. 29766 Longhorn Drive Canyon Lake, California 92380 / US | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Coxon, Philip Eric Potter & Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | Coxon, Philip Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310768.6 | 22.11.1991 | [1992/52] | Priority number, date | US19910717976 | 20.06.1991 Original published format: US 717976 | [1992/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0519137 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
A61B5/0017 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0456 (EP,US);
A61B5/0006 (EP,US);
Y10S128/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/52] | Title | German: | Optoelektrischer Daten-Übertrager | [1992/52] | English: | Optical/electrical transceiver | [1992/52] | French: | Dispositif opto-électrique de transmission de données | [1992/52] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 02.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 12.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/20] | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2130776 (DRAEGERWERK AG); | [X]US3910257 (FLETCHER JAMES C ADMINISTRATOR, et al); | [A]US4004577 (SARNOFF STANLEY J); | [A]GB2003276 (KARZ A) |