EP0488604 - Readily processable polyimide, preparation process of polyimide, and resin composition of polyimide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Wataru 3-42-7 Hirado, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244 / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Akihiro 1-13-24, Zaimokuza Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken 248 / JP | 03 /
Tamai, Shoji 2882, Iijima-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244 / JP | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Anthony Charles, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Rackham, Anthony Charles, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | ||
Former [1992/23] | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310791.8 | 22.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | JP19900320611 | 26.11.1990 Original published format: JP 32061190 | JP19900409104 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40910490 | JP19910046518 | 12.03.1991 Original published format: JP 4651891 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0488604 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0488604 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10, C08K7/02, C08L79/08 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
C08G73/10 (KR);
C08G73/1014 (EP,US);
C08G73/1067 (EP,US);
C08G73/1071 (EP,US);
C08K7/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K7/02, C08L79/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/23] | Title | German: | Leicht zu verarbeitendes Polyimid, dessen Herstellung und Polyimid-Harzzusammensetzung | [1992/23] | English: | Readily processable polyimide, preparation process of polyimide, and resin composition of polyimide | [1992/23] | French: | Polyimide facile à travailler, son procédé de préparation et composition de resine polyimide | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 10.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/14] | 04.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/14] | Request for further processing for: | 20.10.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 20.10.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.11.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0350203 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [Y]EP0313407 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [A]FR2620453 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |