EP0490510 - Two-color focal plane array sensor arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitney, Colin G. 5412 N. Luis Drive Agoura Hills, California 91301 / US | 02 /
Cameron, Bruce A. 4677 Hempstead Street Simi Valley, California 93063 / US | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310825.4 | 25.11.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | US19900624959 | 10.12.1990 Original published format: US 624959 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0490510 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0490510 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B17/00, G02B27/10, G02B23/00 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
G01J3/36 (EP,US);
G01J1/02 (KR);
G02B13/146 (EP,US);
G02B17/00 (KR);
G02B17/0896 (EP,US);
G02B23/12 (EP,US);
G02B27/1013 (EP,US);
G02B27/148 (EP,US);
H04N23/11 (US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Array-Sensor-Anordnung mit einer Fokalebene für zwei Farbbereiche | [1992/25] | English: | Two-color focal plane array sensor arrangement | [1992/25] | French: | Arrangement de detecteurs en forme de réseau ayant un plan focal pour deux domaines de couleur | [1997/43] |
Former [1992/25] | Arrangement de detecteurs en forme de réseau ayant un plan focal pour deux domaine de couleures | Examination procedure | 07.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |