Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0488812
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.04.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
23.04.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] |
10.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.02.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
09.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.01.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
25.11.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.11.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.07.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.06.1998 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.08.1998 [1998/33] |
26.06.1998 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.08.1998 [1998/33] |
04.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.11.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.08.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.06.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.02.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.12.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.11.1996 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.01.1997 [1997/03] |
29.11.1996 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.01.1997 [1997/03] |
03.09.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.05.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.05.1996 |
First examination report |
|
26.04.1996 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] |
03.12.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] |
17.04.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] |