EP0491500 - Document imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states NCR CORPORATION World Headquarters Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lant, David Gordon 113 John Street E. Waterloo, Ontario, N2J 1G2 / CA | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Robert George International Intellectual Property Department AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS LIMITED 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | [1995/02] |
Former [1992/26] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311263.7 | 04.12.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | US19900630454 | 19.12.1990 Original published format: US 630454 | [1992/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0491500 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0491500 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491500 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/028 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
H04N1/02409 (EP,US);
H04N1/03 (EP,US);
H04N1/203 (EP,US);
H04N1/2032 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02456 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02458 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02468 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0247 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02483 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02495 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/26] | Title | German: | Bildinformationsaufnahmesystem für Dokumente | [1992/26] | English: | Document imaging system | [1992/26] | French: | Système de prise de vue pour les documents | [1992/26] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4035073 (DEL VECCHIO GEORGE); | [A]US4833533 (AUGUSTI FERDINANDO [IT], et al); | [A]US4295167 (WIGGINS DOUGLAS G) |