EP0546223 - Fluid flow control valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiyohara, Masako 408, Yamamuro Shimizu-cho Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states Kiyohara, Masako 408, Yamamuro Shimizu-cho Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakazawa, Masahiko 3-13-3, Oji, Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Hisayoshi 21-206, 540 Okuboryoke Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Daley, Michael John, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [1993/24] | Application number, filing date | 91311474.0 | 10.12.1991 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546223 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546223 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16K15/14, F16K15/02 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
F16K15/144 (EP,US);
F16K15/02 (EP,US);
F16K15/148 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7783 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7834 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/24] | Title | German: | Durchflussregelventil | [1993/24] | English: | Fluid flow control valve | [1993/24] | French: | Soupape de régulation de débit | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1991 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB487908 (PHILLIPS & POWIS AIRCRAFT LTD, et al); | [X]US4556086 (RAINES KENNETH C [US]); | [X]US4749003 (LEASON HAYDEN [US]); | [A]US4856555 (GAUSMAN THEODORE J [US], et al) |