Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0546223 | Global Dossier | 29.05.1996 | B1 | EP0546223 | 16.06.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP8477290 | 09.08.1990 | CA2057216 | 06.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2057216 | 04.11.1997 | C | CA2057216 | 07.06.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP8477290 | 09.08.1990 | CA2057216 | 06.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69119909T | 06.02.1997 | T2 | DE69119909D1 | 04.07.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP8477290 | 09.08.1990 | CA2057216 | 06.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2668167B | 27.10.1997 | B2 | JPH04210170 | 31.07.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8477290 | 09.08.1990 | CA2057216 | 06.12.1991 | JP40995390 | 10.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5107885 | 28.04.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8477290 | 09.08.1990 | CA2057216 | 06.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5161571 | 10.11.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8477290 | 09.08.1990 | US65063091 | 05.02.1991 | US80438091 | 10.12.1991 | CA2057216 | 06.12.1991 |